Trustees COLDEN COMMON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1018451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Boniface Chair 27 April 2021
None on record
Kate Bennett Trustee 20 February 2022
None on record
Keith Pinney Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Viktorija Strelcova Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Helen Brown Trustee 04 January 2020
None on record
Rev Damon Draisy Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record