COWES TOWN WATERFRONT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1019760
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £511.82k £539.92k £2.17m £1.80m £1.71m
Total expenditure £477.45k £555.16k £2.40m £1.74m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.35k £1.87m £1.58m £1.50m
Income - Charitable activities £433.82k £438.07k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78.00k £99.50k £295.69k £221.97k £219.48k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £472.05k £555.16k £543.39k £353.93k £462.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.40k £0 £0 £43.13k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.86m £1.38m £1.32m