COWES TOWN WATERFRONT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1019760
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Gordon Scott Greville Trustee 18 December 2018 None on record
Philip Peter Shears Trustee 21 January 2016
MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGY TRUST Received: On time
David William Jaggar Trustee 18 December 2018 None on record
Peter Bruce Morton Trustee 19 December 2016 None on record
Ross Peter Owen Trustee 18 December 2018 None on record
Jacqueline Anne Louise Riley Trustee 19 February 2018 None on record
JEREMY NIGEL DALE Trustee 19 June 2019
MISS ISLE SCHOOL OF SIP & PUFF SAILING Received: On time