Accounts and annual returns FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS

Charity number: 1019969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window