Trustees FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS

Charity number: 1019969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ASHA KASLIWAL Chair 08 October 2013
None on record
Dr Harriet Edge Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Dr Sylvia Kama Trustee 25 November 2021
None on record
Dr Janet Barter Trustee 14 October 2021
FRIENDS OF NIXON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL,SEGBWEMA, SIERRA LEONE
Received: On time
Dr Emma Frances Manson Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Stephen Bowen Trustee 14 November 2019
MANCHESTER PRIDE LIMITED
Received: On time
Nikki Patel Arjuna Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record
Dr Katherine Ann Guthrie Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record
Antoinette Belfield Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record
Avtar Thamia Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Martyn Booth Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Dr Emmert Roberts Trustee 14 December 2017
ALCOHOL RESEARCH UK
Received: On time