THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH

Charity number: 1020916
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop John Francis Sherrington Trustee 06 September 2019 None on record
Alda Dorren Andreotti Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR MARGARET JOHNSON Trustee
FOUNDATION FOR VIRUS ERADICATION Charity reporting is up to date
Richard Ritchie Trustee 11 June 2013 None on record
Simon Patrick Lawless Trustee 28 November 2016 None on record
SIR MARK ALLEN CMG Chair None on record
Charles Fitzherbert Trustee None on record
JULIAN SCHILD MA ACA Trustee None on record
Professor His Honour William Patrick Morris Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
Francis Fitzherbert-Brockholes Trustee 10 February 2020
THE ORATORY SCHOOLS FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Norbert Reis Trustee 25 February 2019 None on record