DRESDEN TRUST

Charity number: 1025905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 July 2020 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 20 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required