Governance MEDECINS SANS FRONTIERES (UK)

Charity number: 1026588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 29 September 1993: Standard registration
  • 27 February 2017: Funds received from 803425 THE RIVERHOLM TRUST
  • 17 April 2019: Funds received from 1068293 THE NOVA CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 25 October 2019: Funds received from 1014779 SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH
  • 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
  • 26 October 2021: Funds received from 1153478 DOCTORS FOR MADAGASCAR UK
  • 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
  • 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1034844 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BANGOR BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 01 September 2022: Funds received from 267055 THE JOAN TANNER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • M S F U K (Working name)
  • MSF (UK) (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property