Accounts and annual returns PURTON AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 1026670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window