Financial history PURTON AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 1026670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £36.28k £55.14k £51.94k £30.81k £6.82k
Total expenditure £28.97k £35.11k £61.31k £29.99k £12.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A