Trustees PURTON AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 1026670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Michael Berry Chair 05 June 2018
None on record
Laura Melanie Phillips Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Georgina Emma Colman Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Andrew Capewell Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
Charlotte Griffin Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
David Warren Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record
Andrew White Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record
ANTHONY HOLBROOK PRICE Trustee 12 May 2011
None on record
Graham Price Trustee 05 April 2005
None on record