Financial history ST ANDREW'S PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £94.54k £128.07k £129.04k £141.73k £131.37k
Total expenditure £107.86k £113.19k £119.88k £141.33k £132.30k
Income from government contracts £55.10k £92.13k £96.32k N/A £98.28k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.12k