BACUP FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES

Charity number: 1027345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 July 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 July 2019 21 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 April 2019 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 April 2019 279 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 05 April 2019 644 days late Download