Trustees 7TH HUDDERSFIELD CLAYTON WEST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1027906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ruth Briggs Chair 16 July 2018
None on record
Catherine Louise Briggs Trustee 27 July 2019
None on record
Susan Thompson Trustee 05 March 2019
None on record
Helen Marie Briggs Trustee 20 March 2017
None on record
Stephen Mills Trustee 06 October 2014
None on record