A M QATTAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1029450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 September 2017 On time Download