BARTON ST DAVID PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033698
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £45.70k £29.74k £20.77k £34.58k £29.36k
Total expenditure £45.70k £31.60k £27.04k £25.48k £23.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £0 N/A £22.59k £24.81k