BARTON ST DAVID PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033698
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Paul Shakesby Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Coralie-Kate Ryan Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Tiffany SEWARD Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
Tanya Jarvis Trustee 13 September 2015 None on record
Christine Calcutt Trustee 15 February 2019
KEINTON MANDEVILLE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST Received: On time
Louise Barbara Margaret Howley Trustee 15 February 2019 None on record
Catherine McMenaman Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
Steven Macabee Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Kimberly Jayne Elliott Trustee 15 February 2019 None on record
Martin James Lister Chair 01 November 2021 None on record