Financial history KEECH HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 1035089
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.05m £10.66m £10.15m £10.97m £12.63m
Total expenditure £9.94m £10.33m £10.77m £10.74m £10.68m
Income from government contracts £1.64m £0 £1 £1.99m £3.21m
Income from government grants £297.00k £1.90m £297.00k £994.00k £4.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.93m £3.24m £2.38m £2.38m £3.88m
Income - Other trading activities £4.89m £4.95m £5.22m £5.18m £1.65m
Income - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.47m £2.54m £2.73m £5.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.00k £2.00k £10.00k £10.00k £2.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £674.00k £1.44m
Income - Legacies £1.01m £1.14m £664 £498.00k £1.33m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.75m £6.04m £6.33m £6.29m £6.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.20m £724.00k £4.43m £4.45m £4.36m
Expenditure - Governance £70.00k £75.00k £88.00k £87.00k £51.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.56m £0 £0 £0