Trustees KEECH HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 1035089
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clive Edward Medlam Chair 29 October 2014
None on record
Chandra Shekar Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Simon Ogden Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Michael John McMahon Trustee 26 March 2020
None on record
Jeffrey Eric Lustig Trustee 26 March 2020
None on record
Miriam Heyes Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record
PETER CANNON Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Frances James Dalton Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
Patricia Ann Norman Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record
BRONWEN MAY PHILPOTT Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
KAREN PROCTOR Trustee 20 March 2011
HEALTHWATCH CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
MARIA COLLINS Trustee
None on record