Accounts and annual returns THE CASTLE BROMWICH LADIES CLUB

Charity number: 1035351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required