Trustees THE CASTLE BROMWICH LADIES CLUB

Charity number: 1035351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillis Parsons ChairLady Chair 27 June 2022
None on record
Freda Reynolds Secretary Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Sue Regan Minute Sec Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
SIAN RIDSDILL Teasurer Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
EDITH DAVIS Treasurer Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
GWEN FRANKLIN Trustee 30 June 2008
None on record
Sheila Higgs Social Com Trustee 01 April 2004
None on record