1ST INKPEN AND KINTBURY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1036011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.54k £9.91k £14.18k £14.53k £34.31k
Total expenditure £6.40k £7.61k £9.03k £14.24k £35.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.33k