ACTION FOR ME

Charity number: 1036419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 14 April 1994: Standard registration
  • 02 January 2015: Funds received from 1011900 CFS RESEARCH FOUNDATION
  • 10 May 2017: Funds received from 1082059 ASSOCIATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH ME LIMITED
  • 16 May 2018: Funds received from 1090755 M.E. NORTH DEVON
  • 18 March 2021: Funds received from 1002764 COLCHESTER M E S H GROUP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AFME (Working name)
  • ACTION FOR M E (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property