ACTION FOR ME

Charity number: 1036419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Deeth Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
David Bernard Leigh Trustee 13 November 2020 None on record
COLIN BATTEN Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
Lucy Goodwill Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
PHILIP WILLIAM FREDERICK MARSDEN Trustee 20 February 2013 None on record
Jane Stacey Trustee 18 December 2013
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
VICTORIA METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Edward Stephens Trustee 16 November 2017 None on record
Philip Murray Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Matt Symonds Trustee 18 November 2016
NOTTINGHAM CONTEMPORARY Received: On time
THE INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR STRATEGIC STUDIES Received: 3 days late
Jonathan Manuel Trustee 11 February 2021 None on record
Shaun Vernon De Boo Trustee 11 February 2021
SHENFIELD PARISH HALL Received: On time
Roger Siddle Chair 15 October 2019 None on record
Susan Hardy Trustee 18 November 2016 None on record