HOLY TRINITY CHURCH OF ENGLAND V A SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required