CONISTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036917
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison RAO Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
WINIFRED MARY WILLIAMS Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
LUCY MARGARET HAMID Trustee
THE PATCHWAY DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY Overdue by 728 days
Robert RAO Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
David Sully Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
LEWIS GRAY Chair None on record
Susan WILLIAMS Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
Eric Gordon Trustee 27 July 2016 None on record
EDWARD NORMAN BATHE-TAYLOR Trustee 13 September 2017 None on record