THE RED LADDER THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1037653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 February 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 December 2017 On time Download