HEATONS-REDDISH GROUP U3A

Charity number: 1037772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maxwell Patrick Wild Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Clare Zita Downing Trustee 17 February 2020 None on record
Carolyn Barbara Canning Trustee 17 February 2020 None on record
Bernice Giblin Trustee 19 January 2015 None on record
John Hewitt Trustee 17 February 2020 None on record
BARBARA DUNNE Trustee 20 January 2014 None on record
Mary Needham Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
THERESA MARIA ROGERS Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record