Financial history FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, EXETER

Charity number: 1040318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £21.94k £16.63k £18.76k £54.28k £12.45k
Total expenditure £50.31k £30.42k £26.83k £21.76k £12.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A