Trustees BORDER PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1040403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICTORIA MORRIS Chair 18 March 2015
None on record
SIAN NORTH Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
CHERYL HAYWARD Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
KATIE FARMER Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Ceri Alice Harris Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
Sam Farr Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record
Rebecca James Trustee 16 June 2010
None on record
JACKIE PUGH Trustee
None on record