Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST ENDELLION CHURCH

Charity number: 1040774
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £11.80k £21.44k £7.53k £7.38k £8.19k
Total expenditure £961 £3.73k £9.49k £14.04k £9.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A