Trustees BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity number: 1044071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor Eglan Brando Brooks Chair 09 December 2021
None on record
Dr Stephen Currow Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Maslin Holness Trustee 22 October 2021
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Kevin Johns Trustee 22 October 2021
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Wederly Aguiar Trustee 22 October 2021
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED
Received: On time
Herminia Mathieu Trustee 22 October 2021
ADVENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (NEWHAM)
Received: On time
ALBERT GARDINER Trustee 22 October 2021
GLOUCESTER ATHLETICS TRACK MANAGEMENT LIMITED
Received: On time
ALL NATIONS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Fortune Mahlangu Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Graham Allcock Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Naomi Rosetta Ninvalle Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Dr Eleazer Paul Dorairaj Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Sam Alphanso Walters Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
David Billett Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Patricia Foriwaa Ababio Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Jovan Adamovic Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Adrian Peck Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Michael Ian Walker Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Krisztian Andrasi Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Sharon Platt-McDonald Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Charles Dafydd Lethbridge Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Michael James Botha Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor Pardon Chenjerai Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Darren Johnson Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Lady Sally-Ann Flemmings-Danquah Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Pastor David Neal Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Pastor Kirk Thomas Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Pastor Emmanuel Osei Trustee 09 April 2017
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
NEWBOLD COLLEGE
Received: On time
SOUTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH DAY ADVENTISTS
Received: On time
ADVENTIST RADIO LONDON
Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED
Received: On time
Elisabeth Sanguesa Trustee 30 June 2016
ADVENTIST BOOK CENTRE (SOUTH) LTD
Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev George Kwame Kumi Trustee 30 June 2016
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED
Received: On time
Pastor Dan Gheorghe Serb Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Pastor John Charles Surridge Trustee 28 July 2006
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED
Received: On time