HORDER HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1046624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 18 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 20 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 20 February 2017 On time Download