PEMBROKESHIRE LOCAL ACTION NETWORK FOR ENTERPRISE AND DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1047268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £798.09k £759.34k £846.93k £1.84m £1.37m
Total expenditure £908.06k £736.88k £806.33k £1.88m £1.48m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £617.59k £498.91k £572.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £688.54k £0 £0 £1.73m £1.24m
Income - Other trading activities £18.81k £0 £14.84k £14.06k £15.02k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £652.19k £737.55k £0 £833
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £90.74k £107.15k £94.54k £99.94k £112.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £14.60k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £899.86k £736.88k £806.33k £1.87m £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.20k £7.46k £8.82k £1.42k £5.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.95k £0