PEMBROKESHIRE LOCAL ACTION NETWORK FOR ENTERPRISE AND DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1047268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 December 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 01 December 2019 124 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 20 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 11 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 11 July 2016 On time Download