Accounts and annual returns AGE UK WALTHAM FOREST

Charity number: 1048212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window