Financial history EAST SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1048827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.08m £1.35m £5.27m £2.13m £2.83m
Total expenditure £948.00k £1.11m £1.62m £4.07m £1.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03m £1.27m £5.03m £2.02m £2.55m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £2.24k £0 £40.05k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £134.54k £20 £139.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £53.00k £81.00k £96.24k £113.02k £92.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.41k
Income - Legacies £616.00k £308.00k £355.70k £719.07k £387.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £816.00k £895.00k £1.30m £3.77m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £132.00k £210.00k £318.66k £301.81k £312.66k
Expenditure - Governance £5.00k £60.00k £105.81k £121.07k £139.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.20k £124.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £15.00k £15.00k £21.78k £27.66k £41.15k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0