Accounts and annual returns EAST SUFFOLK AND NORTH ESSEX NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity number: 1048827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window