Trustees SEXUAL AND DOMESTIC ABUSE & RAPE ADVICE CENTRE (BURTON & DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1049759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Martin Trustee 15 September 2020
SEXUAL ABUSE & RAPE ADVICE CENTRE (BURTON & DISTRICT)
Received: On time
FREEVA
Received: 1 day late
Susan Adey Trustee 20 March 2020
None on record
Philip Goulding Trustee 20 March 2020
None on record
Mary Theresa Bright Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
John McKiernan Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
JO DRUMMOND-CHILD Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record