Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH, ORLESTONE

Charity number: 1050355
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £2.94k £3.98k £3.36k £6.27k £9.89k
Total expenditure £4.46k £2.38k £4.39k £17.90k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A