ST ALBANS CATHEDRAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1051072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 21 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 13 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 13 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 19 May 2017 On time Download