ST ALBANS CATHEDRAL MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1051072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £195.23k £128.26k £95.45k £113.65k £99.95k
Total expenditure £142.71k £90.56k £126.08k £108.29k £112.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A