Financial history AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL UK SECTION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.57m £20.23m £20.12m £18.82m £19.49m
Total expenditure £15.01m £17.37m £20.00m £19.29m £19.98m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £204.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £103.00k £288.00k £204.00k £131.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.17m £15.52m £15.50m £11.94m £14.92m
Income - Other trading activities £2.13m £4.45m £4.35m £6.59m £4.32m
Income - Charitable activities £245.00k £245.00k £245.00k £245.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.00k £17.00k £35.00k £44.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £245.00k
Income - Legacies £4.15m £5.79m £5.63m £4.44m £3.95m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.59m £12.85m £14.95m £14.92m £15.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.42m £4.53m £5.05m £4.37m £4.52m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £25.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £9.50m £10.53m £12.49m £12.82m £13.34m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0