Trustees GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE

Charity number: 1053294
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STELIOS TJIRKALLIS Chair
None on record
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Trustee 11 November 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE)
Received: On time
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST
Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR
Received: On time
Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church
Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: 72 days late
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: 147 days late
Sofoklis Petrides Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
George Loizou Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Kyriacos Hadjikyricou Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Michael Yiannaki Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record
ACHILLEAS LAPOURIDES Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
PANTELIS CHARALAMBOUS Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
JOHN BEHIRE Trustee 12 September 2014
None on record
MARIA PAPANICOLAOU Trustee 12 September 2014
None on record
PHILIP SOTERI Trustee 12 July 2011
None on record
GEORGE STRATIS Trustee
None on record
ANTONAKIS NIKOLAS VOUROU Trustee
None on record
THASOS AVRAAMIDES Trustee
None on record
COSTAS PETER CHRISTOU Trustee
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN COMMUNITIES CENTRAL FUND LIMITED
Received: On time