Accounts and annual returns ROYAL BROMPTON AND HAREFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1053584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late Download Open in new window