CHARTERS-ANCASTER COLLEGE (1995)

Charity number: 1054300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £655.58k £497.94k £291.55k £516.98k £567.65k
Total expenditure £729.29k £607.18k £280.46k £454.85k £536.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £64.60k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £64.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.42k N/A N/A £0 £64.60k
Income - Other trading activities £642.75k N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.99k N/A N/A £513.06k £494.25k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.42k N/A N/A £2.27k £8.80k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £1.65k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £720.86k N/A N/A £453.45k £536.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.42k N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £7.01k N/A N/A £1.40k £0