CHARTERS-ANCASTER COLLEGE (1995)

Charity number: 1054300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL CRUMP Trustee 16 November 2011 None on record
FIONA JANE KELLETT Trustee None on record
James Nathan Cole Trustee 21 May 2021
THE PREHISTORIC SOCIETY Received: 10 days late
DIANA OVERBURY Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
SARAH NORMAN Trustee None on record
Wendy Muriel Hookey Trustee 21 May 2021 None on record
Don Young Trustee 21 March 2017 None on record
Nicky Crump Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record