TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1054547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2017 23 days late Download