TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1054547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.12m £958.63k £1.08m £1.18m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.12m £1.04m £1.04m £1.17m £1.33m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £42.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.90k £55.00k £500 £42.00k £277.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £155.66k £111.17k £50.20k £52.46k £92.00k
Income - Other trading activities £285.26k £262.29k £255.25k £284.70k £300.94k
Income - Charitable activities £677.74k £581.83k £639.17k £739.62k £777.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.29k £3.34k £2.85k £1.92k £2.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £1.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £919.86k £838.78k £838.38k £957.13k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £197.09k £198.52k £202.44k £208.60k £224.75k
Expenditure - Governance £28.49k £22.72k £13.75k £0 £9.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0