TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1054547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN JAMES Trustee 24 January 2014 None on record
Martin Wright Trustee 16 February 2017 None on record
Stuart Mark Benjamin Hopper Trustee 22 November 2018 None on record
Timothy James Cook Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
ALISON GREEN Trustee 17 September 2014 None on record
Judith Tew Trustee 16 February 2017 None on record
MICHAEL STEVENS Chair 23 January 2014 None on record
Hannah BANISTER Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Jonathan James Hill Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record